THE E J TAYLOR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold events to raise money for good causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Peck | Chair | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Yeldham | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brown | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hill | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Taylor | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tozer | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.15k | £795 | £250 | £457 | £962 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.43k | £2.13k | £1.92k | £2.09k | £135 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Works
Burnham Road
Hazeleigh
Chelmsford
Essex
- Phone:
- 01621827993
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window