HOUNSLOW SPORTS CLUB LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER OUTDOOR FIELD SPORTS; 2.TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 June 2021
Total income includes £68,386 from 6 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- 22 May 2020: Standard registration
- 01 December 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- HOUNSLOW SPORTS CLUB LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/06/2020 | 27/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.90k | £68.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.13k | £110.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £68.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 27 June 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 June 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 259 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
1.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER OUTDOOR FIELD SPORTS; 2.TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window