GIVE BACK YOGA FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing education and training in the practice and principles of yoga to personnel engaged in providing support for beneficiaries, supporting the provision of yoga classes, programmes and yoga equipment and supplies in the context of not-for-profit projects in community and health facilities and enabling the integration of yoga into care and treatment services in prisons and hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Schware | Chair | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Stuart | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Schnackenberg | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harriet McAtee | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £10.00k | £12.81k | £15.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £6.92k | £11.25k | £20.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC AND ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION BECAUSE OF SUCH ILLNESS (“BENEFICIARIES”) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE PRACTICE AND PRINCIPLES OF YOGA TO PERSONNEL ENGAGED IN PROVIDING SUPPORT AND CARE TO BENEFICIARIES; (B) SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF YOGA CLASSES, PROGRAMMES AND YOGA EQUIPMENT AND SUPPLIES IN THE CONTEXT OF NOT-FOR-PROFIT PROJECTS IN COMMUNITY AND HEALTH FACILITIES; (C) ENABLING THE INTEGRATION OF YOGA INTO CARE AND TREATMENT SERVICES FOR BENEFICIARIES IN PRISONS, HOSPITALS AND COMMUNITY CENTRES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Mentmore Terrace
LONDON
E8 3PN
- Phone:
- 014695562926
- Email:
- chelsea@eatbreathethrive.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window