PETERBOROUGH LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peterborough Lions Club (CIO-1182110) is a local charity based in Peterborough, we are part of Lions Clubs International, within Multiple District 105 (British Isles) and part of District 105CE covering the counties of Cambridgeshire, Essex, Norfolk, Suffolk, Lincolnshire & Nottinghamshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 February 2019: CIO registration
- 23 April 2019: Funds received from 283355 PETERBOROUGH LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Franklin | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
William Bill Peacock | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Abbigale Rose Heslin | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Frederick Wilcox | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Erica Jane Constable | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Johnstone Pope | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dianne Loraine Parkin | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Ruth Rogers | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.53k | £12.51k | £22.35k | £24.77k | £30.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.44k | £8.22k | £18.93k | £19.24k | £26.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGADN AND WALES AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES, TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED OR ABOUT TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND SELECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 FIVE ARCHES
ORTON WISTOW
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 6FQ
- Phone:
- 0345 833 9534
- Email:
- liondavidpope@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window