City of Southend on Sea Lions Club

Charity number: 1182521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Club serves the local community as well as people internationally. They work with people who are elderly, disabled and / or have disadvantaged benefits, also the wider community by making Southend on Sea a better place to live and work. They also make grants to some national and international appeals (e.g. to relieve poverty, respond to disabilities), extending the public benefit overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £13,036
Total expenditure: £11,355

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2019: CIO registration
  • 21 July 2020: Funds received from 1049333 SOUTHEND ON SEA LIONS CLUB TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SOUTHEND ON SEA LIONS CLUB (CIO) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tayf Zildizeli Chair 01 September 2024
None on record
Rodney George Nolan Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
William George WHITE Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
ROGER JAMES FULLER Trustee 14 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.90k £10.63k £17.39k £13.04k £13.04k
Total expenditure £14.76k £9.21k £15.41k £11.36k £11.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 08 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
262 Blenheim Chase
LEIGH-ON-SEA
Essex
SS9 3HQ
Phone:
07513765091