THE CHARITY OF THE ROMAN UNION OF THE ORDER OF ST URSULA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, education and training, religious activities, the prevention or relief of poverty, overseas aid/famine relief Helps: children / young people, elderly/old people, other charities / voluntary bodies, general public/mankind How: provides human resources, provides buildings/ facilities./open space provides services, grants to organisations Where: England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£2,666,281
Donations and legacies | £902.44k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £460.14k | |
Other | £1.30m |
Total expenditure:
£1,568,850
Raising funds | £105.64k | |
Charitable activities | £1.46m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,195,866 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £105.64k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.46m | |
Retained for future use | £1.10m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £105.64k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.46m | |
Retained for future use | £2.29m |
People

13 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 December 2019: CIO registration
- 09 December 2021: Funds received from 245661 THE CHARITY OF THE ROMAN UNION OF THE ORDER OF ST ...
- URSULINES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Mary Colmer | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Almerinda Elena D'Aprano | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Kelly | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Jeremy Richardson | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ann Dolours Moloney | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN ASHPOLE | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.46m | £1.35m | £1.46m | £2.67m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.42m | £1.60m | £1.65m | £1.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £955.66k | £942.98k | £974.51k | £902.44k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £232.45k | £1.92k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £250.09k | £381.64k | £448.26k | £460.14k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £19.17k | £19.05k | £42.21k | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £5.37k | £9.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.34m | £1.49m | £1.54m | £1.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £76.96k | £113.60k | £105.93k | £105.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £9.72k | £12.24k | £61.25k | £54.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £15.00k | £22.21k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £76.96k | £113.60k | £105.93k | £105.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £6.69m | £6.67m | £6.66m | £3.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £16.51m | £15.30m | £14.21m | £15.33m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £1.84m | £1.42m | £2.17m | £6.60m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £207.16k | £281.29k | £291.49k | £108.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE ORDER AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL PRIORESS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. IF AT ANY TIME THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE ORDER SHALL CEASE TO EXIST THEN FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ORDER AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PRIORESS GENERAL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. IF AT ANY TIME THE ORDER SHALL CEASE TO EXIST THEN FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ursuline Provincialate
38 GROSVENOR ROAD
LONDON
E7 8JA
- Phone:
- 0203 422 0901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window