Martsang Kagyu UK Buddhist Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Martsang Kagyu tradition is an 855-year-old, unbroken order of traditional Tibetan Buddhism of which His Holiness Gangri Karma Rinpoche an accomplished Master. Our philosophy covers the complete teaching of Buddhist original theory and practice as. We exercise various practices of meditation for insight, wisdom, compassion to improved physical and mental health.Throughout England & Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2019: CIO registration
- MARTSANG KAGYU LONDON BUDDHIST CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
His Holiness Gangri Karma Rinpoche Chokyi Gyaltsen | Chair | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ann Bryson | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julian Alexander McIntyre | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £575 | £27.80k | £21.59k | £14.95k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £349 | £14.37k | £11.32k | £12.74k | £3.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE BUDDHISM IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MARTSANG KAGYU TRADITION OF TIBETAN BUDDHISM MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, SEMINARS, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND MEDITATION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE BUDDHIST RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Crossways
The Green
Haddenham
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 3TP
- Phone:
- 07983177114
- Email:
- london@martsangkagyu.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window