THE UNDER THE PARISH LANTERN PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH MAES Y BRYN PRIMARY SCHOOL LLANWIT FARDRE

Charity Number: 513591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF A PRIZE TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY TO THE PUPIL JUDGED TO BE THE OUTSTANDING SCHOLAR OF THE YEAR

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4
Total expenditure: £11

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RHONDDA CYNON TAF CBC Trustee
RHONDDA CYNON TAF CHARITY FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED
Received: On time
THE ROMA DAVID AWARD FOR OUTSTANDING SCHOLASTIC ATTAINMENT
Received: On time
THE ABERDARE PUBLIC PARK
Received: On time
CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH BRYN CELYNNOG COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL
Received: On time
RHYS DAVIES LITERATURE PRIZE
Received: On time
M H DAVIES PRIZE FOR MATHEMATICS
Received: On time
PRIZE FUNDS IN CONNECTION WITH TONYREFAIL COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL
Received: On time
STEPHEN WRIGHT MEMORIAL PRIZE
Received: On time
THE GLAN LLOYD PRIZE
Received: On time
THE UNDER THE PARISH LANTERN PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH YSGOL GYMRAEG GARTH OLWG
Received: On time
THE MEGAN G REES PRIZE
Received: On time
BRYNNA MINERS WELFARE GROUND ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ABERDARE OLD CEMETERY
Received: On time
THE UNDER THE PARISH LANTERN PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH GWAUNCELYN JUNIOR SCHOOL TONTEG
Received: On time
THE UNDER THE PARISH LANTERN PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH LLANILLTUD FAERDREF JUNIOR SCHOOL
Received: On time
HIRWAUN CEMETERY
Received: On time
BARRY TODD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
YSGOLORIAETH SARAH THOMAS I FERCHED YSGOL CWMCLYDACH
Received: On time
IEUAN THOMAS GEOGRAPHY PRIZE
Received: On time
YNYSANGHARAD WAR MEMORIAL PARK
Received: On time
THE HISTORY OF LLANTRISANT PRIZE
Received: On time
ABERDARE NEW CEMETERY
Received: On time
PHILLIPS MEMORIAL PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH PONT SION NORTON WELSH SCHOOL
Received: On time
PENYWAUN RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND
Received: On time
THE ARTHUR HOPKIN MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND IN CONNEXION WITH PORTH COUNTY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS
Received: On time
THE ESTHER ELKAN MEMORIAL PRIZE
Received: On time
THE EVAN WILDE MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND PENTRE COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE JOHN HAYDN THOMAS PRIZE
Received: On time
WELSH CHURCH ACT FUND WITHIN THE AREAS OF RHONDDA CYNON TAFF, BRIDGEND AND MERTHYR TYDFIL COUNTY BOROUGH COUNCILS
Received: On time
THE MERFYN GRIFFITHS MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
GLYNDWR LLOYD TREHARNE AND EILEEN TREHARNE SCHOLARSHIPS CHARITY
Received: On time
LLWYNYPIA EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE EDWARD THOMAS CHARITY (LLANWONNO)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4 £4 £3 £3 £4
Total expenditure £0 £3 £3 £3 £11
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rhondda Cynon Taff County Borough
Council
Council Offices
Bronwydd
PORTH
CF39 9DL
Phone:
01443680734
Website:

No information available