JAMES PEACOCK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance for educational purposes only to individuals up to age 25 resident, or parents resident, in Ruddington, Nottingham. Assistance to local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 14 March 1983: Standard registration
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 December 2013: Re-registered
- JAMES PEACOCK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (RUDDINGTON) (Working name)
- PEACOCK TRUST - PEACOCK CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Clydesdale | Chair | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jessica McGowan Mrs | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Burrows | Trustee | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Griffin | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Corder | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Moore | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAY STEER | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.97k | £6.68k | £7.09k | £9.42k | £9.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.97k | £5.33k | £4.58k | £8.76k | £8.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JUNE 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF RUDDINGTON. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 19 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RUDDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 NORTH ROAD
RUDDINGTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 6AD
- Phone:
- 07800743386
- Email:
- jpfoundationrudd@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window