Financial history THE MULCHAND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £228.75k £106.51k £256.62k £2.84k £269.65k
Total expenditure £57.59k £69.42k £120.85k £111.29k £299.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A