MOUNT SHILOH APOSTOLIC CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Church Services Sunday 11.30am to 1.30pm Church/Community day trips Evangelistic Outreach Services Leadership Conference Fellowship Meals - with partner churches Conduct/Host - Weddings, Funerals and Baby Blessings Sleepovers - groups of young people engage in social/spiritual activities on church premises including overnight stay
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 19 February 2019: CIO registration
- 14 September 2019: Funds received from 1152050 MOUNT SHILOH APOSTOLIC CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan Milton Grizzle | Chair | 27 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Samuel Henry | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Junior Bennett | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marie Douglas | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Chrick Griffin | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gilroy Altamond Brown | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SONIA IONIE BENNETT | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shemaine Vanessa Alexis Brade | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.37k | £19.91k | £27.62k | £34.85k | £32.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.43k | £21.21k | £23.48k | £31.56k | £32.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 April 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN LOCALITIES OF THE CHURCH AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mount Shiloh House
Hickman Avenue
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV1 2BS
- Phone:
- 01902 870566
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window