DOMESTIC ABUSE SURVIVORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE SUFFERING OF VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, HOUSEHOLD AND PERSONAL ITEMS IN ORDER TO HELP SURVIVORS START OVER AGAIN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,856 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Hillingdon
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 12 June 2019: CIO registration
- HELPING HANDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Wheaton | Chair | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carly Slade | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
KELLY WILLCOX | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Hayley Adams | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £284.74k | £44.30k | £117.37k | £13.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £252.49k | £53.02k | £94.54k | £17.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.77k | £6.86k | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £3.12k | £797 | £26.31k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE SUFFERING OF VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, HOUSEHOLD AND PERSONAL ITEMS IN ORDER TO HELP SURVIVORS START OVER AGAIN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Claritas Accountancy Ltd
1 Peach Street
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG40 1XJ
- Phone:
- 07341440894
- Email:
- vicki.wheaton@aol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window