THE PETER AND MOIRA KILMARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1184465
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

No activities to date

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 19 December 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Kilmartin Chair 19 December 2018
None on record
Jamie Angus Barraclough Trustee 19 December 2018
None on record
Moira Kilmartin Trustee 19 December 2018
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/12/2020 19/12/2021 19/12/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 19 December 2022 17 January 2025 456 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2020 22 December 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HIGH TREES
LAYTON AVENUE
RAWDON
LEEDS
LS19 6QQ
Phone:
01132509513
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available