Accounts and annual returns FINDMEGHANA

Charity number: 1184096
Charity reporting is overdue by 1590 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 129 days
Annual return 01 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 495 days
Annual return 01 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 860 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 860 days
Annual return 01 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1225 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1225 days
Annual return 01 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1590 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1590 days