Trustees THE PRICEHOLME TRUST CIO
Charity number: 1185571

Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Tweddle | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Patrick Neill Lewis | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Baker | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Anthea Hackett | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|||||
SUSAN KARLE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|||||
TOBIN FEARFIELD DENNIS | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.