Financial history CONGREGATION OF OUR LADY OF SION (UK)

Charity number: 1183036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £1.45m £585.17k £4.94m £683.97k
Total expenditure £141 £1.20m £9.59m £5.55m £846.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.78k £4.22k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £833.64k £254.32k £833.00k £223.66k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £621.13k £330.86k £429.88k £460.31k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £3.68m £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £35.62k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £853.93k £9.54m £5.51m £765.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £344.68k £53.09k £46.29k £81.15k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £104.51k £18.00k £19.80k £19.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £72.44k £10.47k £32.63k £33.31k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0