Accounts and annual returns SHARDLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 513618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 February 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late Download Open in new window