Financial history SHARDLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 513618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.62k £22.76k £21.44k £15.95k £44.93k
Total expenditure £55.83k £6.59k £28.31k £21.92k £37.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.00k £17.00k £10.67k N/A £7.90k