SHARDLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shardlow Village Hall serves as a hub for community activity, hosting a diverse range of events, meetings and activities. The venue offers a welcoming space for various local groups, such as fitness groups, playgroups, the WI, the local football club, and many more. It offers local residents of all ages a space to gather, socialise, and engage in a wide range of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,903 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Eccles | Chair | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Helen Smith | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Bird | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Adams | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Mitchell | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Spray | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Spray | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.62k | £22.76k | £21.44k | £15.95k | £44.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.83k | £6.59k | £28.31k | £21.92k | £37.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.00k | £17.00k | £10.67k | N/A | £7.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1970. as amended on 11 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
PROPERTY TO BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR PURPOSE OF VILLAGE HALL FOR INHABITANTS OF PARISH OF SHARDLOW AND GREAT WILNE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHARDLOW AND GREAT WILNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shardlow Village Hall
The Wharf
Shardlow
DERBY
DE72 2GH
- Phone:
- 07386 893654
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window