DOWN SYNDROME UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Down Syndrome UK works to improve the lives of people with Down syndrome, and their families. We primarily work in maternity care and early years, providing resources, training and support to parents and professionals to empower those with Down syndrome to thrive and flourish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
174 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 July 2019: CIO registration
- DSUK (Working name)
- PADS (Working name)
- Positive About Down Syndrome (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Casimir Stephen Bower Knight | Chair | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Fox | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ayesha Mahmud | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Francis Baker | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Frances Simpson | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE WARREN | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.27k | £191.97k | £245.69k | £317.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £93.08k | £253.10k | £321.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF PARENTS AND FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DOWN SYNDROME IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A FORUM THAT PROVIDES ACCURATE UP TO DATE INFORMATION ON THE REALITIES OF LIVING WITH DOWN SYNDROME AND IS A CENTRAL HUB OF INFORMATION AND RESOURCES FOR THE CONDITION
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 HILL CLOSE
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 7RQ
- Phone:
- 03301112121
- Email:
- info@downsyndromeuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window