WATERS UPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 513630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To manage a building for holding communal activities and for hire to local residents of the civil parish of Waters Upton and groups operating therein

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £3,552
Total expenditure: £4,885

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Telford & Wrekin

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR J R WILLIAMS Chair
THE RED POLL CATTLE SOCIETY
Received: On time
David Inkster Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
Lynda Baker Oliver Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
MR N QUIN Trustee
None on record
MRS K BAKER Trustee
TELFORD'S VETERAN TRAIL
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.09k £19.03k £2.26k £3.34k £3.55k
Total expenditure £6.46k £6.40k £3.71k £7.99k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 10 April 2024 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 07 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Burbage Vale
Penkridge
STAFFORD
ST19 5PF
Phone:
01785716730
Website:

No information available