Financial history CHESHIRE OUTREACH

Charity Number: 1186924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/06/2020 12/06/2021 12/06/2022 12/06/2023 12/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A