LIFEWATER UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of clean and safe drinking water which results in the reduction/elimination of water-borne diseases, resulting in improved health, higher attendance rates at school and, consequently, better educational outcomes and improved ability to work, thus relieving poverty. We will also provide Water and Sanitation Hygiene (WASH) training for improved sanitation and hygiene.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burundi
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- South Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 18 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLENYS SANDRA LONDON | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||
Roger Charles London | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||
Alastair John Patience | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||
LORRAINE JANET PATIENCE | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||
Paul Johannes Muller | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.70k | £65.46k | £92.10k | £103.34k | £109.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.35k | £84.12k | £79.61k | £108.44k | £124.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, NEED OR HARDSHIP BY SUPPLYING HYGIENE TRAINING AND WATER PURIFICATION EQUIPMENT TO HOMES, SCHOOLS, HEALTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRES, AND REFUGEE CAMPS, IN AFRICA, OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 CLARENDON ROAD
MORECAMBE
LA3 1SD
- Phone:
- 07432097592
- Email:
- lifewaterafrica@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window