Accounts and annual returns SCHEDA ALI TRUST

Charity number: 1185339
Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required