PARLI-PEOPLE

Charity number: 1182016
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parli-People.org aims to advance the education and development of Parliament Hill School pupils through organising activities in which the staff, pupils and parents and carers can participate; in order to establish and develop a community around the school. Fundraising through raffles, events, and appeals aims to generate a fund which can be used to help pay for certain requirements

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £11,917
Total expenditure: £12,169

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Runacres Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record
KAREN SMITH Trustee 24 January 2018
None on record
Sarah Creasey Trustee 24 January 2018
PARLIAMENT HILL SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
SIMON CARRUTHERS Trustee 24 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £2.13k £11.13k £13.66k £11.92k
Total expenditure £927 £8.62k £5.62k £12.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 18 August 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PARLI-PEOPLE
Parliament Hill School
Highgate Road
LONDON
NW5 1RL
Phone:
02074857077