Financial history KIJANA KWANZA (YOUNG PEOPLE FIRST)

Charity number: 1183099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.19k £245.67k £413.04k £608.26k £883.63k
Total expenditure £41.87k £221.24k £389.65k £591.71k £851.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £605.94k £877.46k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £475 £6.17k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.04k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £120 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £674 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £591.71k £788.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £62.40k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £9.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £499.60k £729.73k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £480