Financial history IN PLACE OF WAR CIO

Charity number: 1182594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £265.48k £251.47k £241.14k £294.21k £441.41k
Total expenditure £231.26k £263.64k £275.49k £378.64k £410.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A