GLOBAL FUND FOR JESUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty worldwide through the mobilisation of resources. The advancement of education in methods of food production in developing countries. General relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Kent
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH CHARLES TRIPP | Chair | 15 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lyndon Mark Sanders | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatomi Adeoye Oyebanji | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £287 | £22.08k | £5.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £536 | £382 | £15.06k | £13.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY WORLDWIDE THROUGH THE MOBILISATION OF RESOURCES. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN METHODS OF FOOD PRODUCTION IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Mickleden Green
Whitwick
COALVILLE
Leicestershire
LE67 5PP
- Phone:
- +447825527735
- Email:
- GFFJUK@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window