Financial history MASJID OMAR

Charity number: 1182378
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.52k £67.78k £118.15k £125.79k £118.12k
Total expenditure £75.78k £79.43k £89.86k £126.76k £139.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.01k £2.91k N/A N/A