CATHOLIC MOTHERS APOSTOLATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talks conferences and workshops as well as products and publishing to help Catholic Mothers know their faith better and pass it on in the family and the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHIARA FINALDI | Chair | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PIER PAOLO FINALDI | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERTA BELLONE | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.85k | £55.55k | £79.90k | £84.45k | £49.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.29k | £50.17k | £87.50k | £86.99k | £54.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE FAITH OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (2) TO PROMOTE THE FAITH OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AMONGST FAMILIES IN ENGLAND THROUGH EVENTS, COURSES, PUBLICATIONS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORKS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
155 Bromley Road
London
SE6 2NZ
- Phone:
- 02036891245
- Email:
- CatholicMothersUK@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window