SILENT UPROAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the Arts, particularly theatre, through the presentation of performances and skills development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roberta Nicholson | Chair | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Yates | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kofi Smiles | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.76k | £56.23k | £147.46k | £164.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.92k | £62.60k | £150.94k | £104.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | £8.00k | £30.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND DRAMA AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE, AND OTHER FINE ARTS ESPECIALLY THOSE ACTIVITIES WHICH SEEK TO MAKE THE ARTS RELEVANT TO THE PUBLIC INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, COMEDY, PERFORMING ARTS, MIME, DRAMATIC IMPROVISATION, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, DANCE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING AND TO FORMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Warren
Queens Dock Chambers
47-49 Queens Dock Avenue
HULL
HU1 3DR
- Phone:
- 07855801234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window