AFRICAN RAINBOW FAMILY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
African Rainbow Family is the Leading National Expert by Experience Grassroots Charity Campaigning and Advocating for Racial Justice and Human Rights of LGBTIQ Refugees and People Seeking Asylum of African Heritage and the Global Majority. We provide psychotherapeutic group and peer supports, training, counselling, advocacy, advice, information, employability, moving-on and integration services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Regina Mensah | Chair | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Brian Humphreys | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Chady | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie MichelleIvy Elizabeth Brown | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Martirosjana | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tsegazeab Redda | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kudirat Oluwatoyin Abodunde | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.82k | £241.63k | £168.66k | £245.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.05k | £155.13k | £150.03k | £178.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND INTERSEX REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM; 2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND INTERSEX PEOPLE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND, BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING ADVICE AND SUPPORT; 3. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND INTERSEX PEOPLE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MONASTERY
89 GORTON LANE
MANCHESTER
M12 5WF
- Phone:
- 03333356326
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window