THE OWL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Rescue and Rehabilitate injured and sick Owls to the wild, also if they can not be returned to the wild we will look after them for the rest of their natural days with us in a bespoke Owl Sanctuary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Total income includes £4,763 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 09 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GERARD GROVE | Chair | 08 February 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £35.21k | £163.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £19.78k | £130.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.57k | £4.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 514 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 514 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 31 December 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 31 December 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 October 2021 | 298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF OWLS AND RAPTORS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS OWLS AND RAPTORS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 FOXFIELD ROAD
WALNEY
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
LA14 3SJ
- Phone:
- 07505027007
- Email:
- paul.rose01@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window