Trustees ROYAL AIR FORCE GOLF ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1182978

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Clarke | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Mulroney | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Paterson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Mudd | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cameron James Kinvig | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Mardon | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.