THE YOUTH BOOTH

Charity number: 1183734
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Youth Booth funds and facilitates a range of youth and community services. As a charity our objectives are to provide a safe space for young people to meet and enjoy each others company and to help young people to prepare for life as good citizens.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022

Total income: £51,889
Total expenditure: £24,945

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 2019: CIO registration
  • 29 July 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 29 July 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £15.73k £30.38k £51.89k
Total expenditure £8.62k £16.47k £24.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.50k N/A £7.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2020 28 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 28 November 2020 On Time