FRIENDS OF GOAT LEES PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1182969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise money by holding various events at the school, such as summer and Christmas fairs, craft events and Discos. These events raise money for additional equipment and resources to enhance the children education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £9,991
Total expenditure: £9,235

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chelsea Pilbeam Chair 26 September 2024
None on record
Amanda Coppins Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Sarah Norris Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.50k £848 £10.18k £11.56k £9.99k
Total expenditure £2.52k £2.05k £6.83k £8.23k £9.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 July 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Goat Lees Primary School
Hurst Road
Kennington
ASHFORD
TN24 9RR
Phone:
01233630201
Website:

No information available