THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF S. PAUL, DEPTFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
S. Paul's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the rector, in promoting the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for S. Paul's Church, Deptford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £648 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lewisham
Governance
- 04 April 2019: Standard registration
- S. PAUL'S DEPTFORD PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF S. PAUL WITH S. MARK, DEPTFORD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul David Butler B.A. HONS. | Chair | 15 October 2006 |
|
|||||
Derek Rodwick Amoo | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Sancroft-Homiah | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Roberts | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Vijay Bhullar | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Virginia Pan | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William John Dawes Mr | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Alan Humphries | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Edward David Richards | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Madeleine Makaya Nzouzi | Trustee | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Olive May Nelson | Trustee | 18 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 18 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Addokwei | Trustee | 14 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Lavern Marie-Anne Ford | Trustee | 25 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
Vidal Veronica Eghan | Trustee | 22 March 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.73k | £53.09k | £78.31k | £78.47k | £166.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.84k | £52.29k | £46.68k | £48.66k | £52.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £326 | N/A | £648 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957 as amended on 19 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS CHURCH
Crossfield Street
off Deptford High Street
LONDON
SE8 3DS
- Phone:
- 02086927449
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window