WINCHESTER AND DISTRICT ATHLETICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of athletics training and competition. Based at Winchester University's outdoor sports centre Details on the club's web site - www.wadac.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 March 2019: CIO registration
- 07 June 2019: Funds received from 1108801 WINCHESTER AND DISTRICT ATHLETICS CLUB
- WADAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Mann | Chair | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Walker Hunter | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Joslin | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Cox | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Gill | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA JANE WILSON | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Bowyer | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Tracy Thatcher | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Miles | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.14k | £55.87k | £77.99k | £91.37k | £83.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.61k | £34.71k | £63.39k | £85.40k | £97.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.05k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMPETITION AND COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN ATHLETICS AND OTHER RELATED SPORTS SUCH AS TRIATHLONS AND DUATHLONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WINCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS AND OTHER SPORTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Pitter Close
Littleton
Winchester
Hampshire
SO22 6PD
- Phone:
- 07976854783
- Email:
- secretary@wadac.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window