Accounts and annual returns THE UFFCULME VILLAGE HALL TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1183742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 24 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 24 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 27 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 30 December 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 30 December 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 18 January 2022 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 13 January 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window