Foothold Cymru

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Building Social Action is a social justice charity operating in West Wales. Our focus is on tackling the causes and consequences of poverty through a range of capacity building activities and services; recognising that the solutions and the skills to put them in place, are found in the lived experiences of the people and communities affected.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£877,188
Donations and legacies | £87.33k | |
Charitable activities | £721.07k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £68.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£844,145
Raising funds | £50.41k | |
Charitable activities | £793.74k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £10,265 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £793.74k | |
Retained for future use | £33.04k |
People

18 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 23 March 2020: Standard registration
- CBSA (Working name)
- THE CENTRE FOR BUILDING SOCIAL ACTION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fred St-John Roberts JP | Chair | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Shorland | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rees | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Thomas | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Goodfellow-Smith | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Louise Rivers | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paolo Piana | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN ELDON PHILLIPS | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Anthony Freeman | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derith Powell OBE | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Hugh Lewis | Trustee | 26 September 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £857.76k | £904.80k | £889.67k | £877.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £835.56k | £828.88k | £836.90k | £844.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.00k | £6.09k | £10.27k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.63k | £23.62k | £35.26k | £87.33k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £732.52k | £776.85k | £740.88k | £721.07k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £118.60k | £104.33k | £88.23k | £68.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £25.31k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £805.68k | £781.97k | £803.56k | £793.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £29.88k | £46.91k | £33.34k | £50.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.50k | £5.00k | £23.09k | £10.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.88k | £25.84k | £28.62k | £24.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £76.37k | £50.92k | £748.38k | £667.92k | |
|
Long-term investments | £880.67k | £826.92k | £2 | £2 | |
|
Other assets | £114.12k | £211.85k | £323.26k | £420.36k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £197.12k | £139.73k | £68.91k | £52.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAR 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 MAR 2020 as amended on 27 May 2021 as amended on 02 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF WALES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) EQUIPPING DISADVANTAGED OR OTHERWISE EXCLUDED PEOPLE WITH THE SKILLS AND COMPETENCIES REQUIRED TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR IDENTIFYING AND MEETING THEIR NEEDS AND THOSE OF THE COMMUNITY; B) THE DELIVERY OF FORMAL, INFORMAL AND COMMUNITY EDUCATION PROGRAMMES THAT PROVIDE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE OPPORTUNITIES TO GAIN NATIONALLY RECOGNISED QUALIFICATIONS AND/OR DEVELOP THE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND COMPETENCIES REQUIRED FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING AND THE LABOUR MARKET; C) THE PROMOTION, PROVISION AND FACILITATION OF VOLUNTEERING, TRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE OPPORTUNITIES TO UNEMPLOYED OR UNDEREMPLOYED PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED IN THE LABOUR MARKET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lord Arthur Rank Centre
Trostre Road
Llanelli
SA14 9RA
- Phone:
- 01554779910
- Email:
- jmorgan@cbsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window