SAI GRACE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sai Grace Trust is a Retreat Centre, where we teach and advance education and understanding of the practice and philosophy of Meditation, Yoga and devotional singing. We also conduct Inter-Faith Services. We minister to people of all faiths and none, providing spiritual counselling and pastoral services. Particularly, but not exclusively in the accordance with the teachings of Sri Sathya Sai Baba.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 07 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LEONORA VAWN VAN GILS | Chair | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sukhjit Ahluwalia | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Toni Newson | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.35k | £2.63k | £3.17k | £1.29k | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.46k | £5.56k | £10.65k | £3.68k | £1.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 May 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SPIRITUAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY:- (A) THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, GUIDANCE AND ADVICE TO THOSE IN NEED THEREOF; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PRACTICE AND PHILOSOPHY OF YOGA AND MEDITATION; (C) THE PRACTICE OF NON-DENOMINATIONAL SPIRITUAL AND PASTORAL SERVICES; PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF SRI SATHYA SAI BABA, AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS OF THOSE TEACHINGS TO THE PUBLIC. 3.2 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS IN INDIA TOWARDS RELIEF IN NEED AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Greenside
Darsham
SAXMUNDHAM
Suffolk
IP17 3FB
- Phone:
- 01728668404
- Email:
- saigraceuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window