MONK FRYSTON AND HILLAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our voluntarily managed and operated charity provides our Village Community Centre, Playground and other facilities. We organise socially inclusive events, either independently or with other village groups, and lead, support or promote existing and new social activities. We promote or lead wider community initiatives within our broad constitutional objective of promoting educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 March 2019: CIO registration
- 16 June 2020: Funds received from 523782 MONK FRYSTON AND HILLAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Gaye Whittingham | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Thomas Johnson | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seph OConnell | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fleming | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Archibald Force | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Giles Parkin | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.62k | £78.72k | £38.85k | £67.20k | £64.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.94k | £66.73k | £26.64k | £58.68k | £77.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.17k | £21.94k | £12.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Mar 2019 as amended on 11 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MONK FRYSTON AND HILLAN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, RACE OE OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. 2) TO ASSOCIATE TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, WELLBEING AND COMMUNITY COHESION. 3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Monk Fryston and Hillam CA
Community Centre
Old Vicarage Lane
Monk Fryston
LEEDS
LS25 5EA
- Phone:
- 01977682693
- Email:
- rparkin71@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window