Accounts and annual returns SHARED VISION

Charity number: 1189370
Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 30 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 30 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days
Annual return 30 March 2021 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 03 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window