SADIE BRISTOW FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide an athletic tennis sports module in primary schools. To raise awareness of Anaphalxis and allergies, fund nurses in training to become specialists in this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 18 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Angelica Madrid Fernandez | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Shuai | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Elizabeth Hamilton-West | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Steven Jordan | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eve Ashley | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Bristow | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.31k | £17.51k | £20.67k | £12.93k | £26.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.36k | £6.00k | £18.86k | £9.38k | £18.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY ORGANISING OR PROVIDING FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TENNIS OR MINI TENNIS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT SEVERE ALLERGIC CONDITIONS AND WHERE PRACTICAL HELP AND SUPPORT CAN BE FOUND; (B) MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES TO FUND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE AND CARE OF SEVERE ALLERGIC CONDITIONS (PROVIDED THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH IS PUBLISHED); (C) MAKING GRANTS AND OTHER FINANCIAL PROVISION FOR THE TRAINING OF NURSES AND OTHER MEDICAL STAFF INVOLVED IN THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WITH SEVERE ALLERGIC CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 The Crescent
Chartham
CANTERBURY
CT4 7PX
- Phone:
- 07595259236
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window