LONDON YOUNG STARS ELITE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
London Young Stars Elite is a charity based in Isle of Dogs who offer sports and music for kids and young people. We use the power of sport and music to deter kids away from gangs and crime. We are very conscious about health and wellbeing and offer classes/services to promote this to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,680 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 02 September 2019: CIO registration
- YOUNG STARS ELITE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Kirrage | Chair | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Clarke | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR SALAKO | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
YDDALAZ ADDY | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dayo Martins | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Manning-Joseph | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/02/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.58k | £67.83k | £69.17k | £58.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.28k | £69.77k | £86.57k | £60.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 16 APR 2020
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO PLAY ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (“FACILITIES” MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES) 2)TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE, NFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR ONDITIONS OF LIFE)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemp House
124 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07376501684
- Email:
- youngstarselite@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window