Trustees FRIENDS OF BUXTON INTERNATIONAL FESTIVAL
Charity Number: 1184840

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Spence Crowe | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Mandy Blanche Travis | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rees David Webster | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edna Sophia Williams | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gillian Anne Brown | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Gaunt | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANTHONY PARSONS | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE POTTER | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Matthews | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judy Barker | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.