ELSWORTH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1182649
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Early years childcare setting for children age 2-4 years

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £85,659
Total expenditure: £74,330

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 March 2019: CIO registration
  • 01 March 2022: Funds received from 276795 ELSWORTH PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chaya Robertson Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Matthew Charles Cook KC Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Charles Patrick James Gouldsbrough Trustee 18 December 2024
None on record
Kate-Lyn Piek Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Sophie Natalia Helen Ambrosine Dworetzsky Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £54.58k £65.72k £63.10k £85.66k
Total expenditure £50.68k £53.51k £62.86k £74.33k
Income from government contracts £36.62k £64.51k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 September 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 September 2024 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 November 2023 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2023 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 March 2023 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 March 2023 266 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 January 2022 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 January 2022 208 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Elsworth Pre School
Broad End
Elsworth
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 4JD
Phone:
01954268050