THE DIANNE OXBERRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness of the symptoms and issues surrounding ovarian cancer to women, including those in the highest risk groups, predominantly but not exclusively across the North-West of England To raise awareness within the medical and clinical professions of the importance of early detection and diagnosis of ovarian cancer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Collins | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Rosenberg | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Siobhan Ferguson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hindle | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.74k | £17.61k | £48.71k | £56.71k | £47.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.78k | £15.85k | £24.99k | £51.45k | £68.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 19 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2019 AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE AFFECTED BY OVARIAN CANCER IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO:- • HELP AND SUPPORT THOSE AFFECTED BY OVARIAN CANCER; • RAISE AWARENESS OF OVARIAN CANCER; • CONTRIBUTE TO EDUCATION IN RESPECT OF OVARIAN CANCER AND ITS SYMPTOMS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Wodehouse Direct
Warren Bruce Court
Warren Bruce Road
Trafford Park
Manchester
M17 1LB
- Phone:
- 07754 260115
- Email:
- info@dianneoxberrytrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window