COLKINS MILL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Colkins Mill Church welcomes people for public worship each week in Mayfield, East Sussex - a congregation of between 30 and 50 people, together with a small Sunday School for children. We have mid-week homegroups for worship, discipleship, prayer and support. The Church runs term-time youth clubs for village children, and we host a monthly celebration for people with learnng difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 25 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jules Steinegger | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Catherine Warner | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Phillip Warner | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Harland | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN HARLAND | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Teresa Steinegger | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.06k | £56.82k | £26.33k | £44.24k | £35.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.76k | £97.83k | £27.63k | £53.75k | £50.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN MAYFIELD, EAST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLKINS MILL CHURCH
STATION ROAD
MAYFIELD
TN20 6BT
- Phone:
- 01435873194
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window