ADDINGHAM SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cubs, Scouts and Beavers in the village of Addingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 06 April 1983: Standard registration
- 1ST ADDINGHAM SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- ADDINGHAM SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Michael Crampton | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Reid | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Liversidge | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Jennings | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Reid | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alizabeth Caroline Bradley | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Griffin | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MS MAZ JENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £7.43k | £6.53k | £48.62k | £36.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.82k | £4.66k | £4.45k | £45.89k | £24.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Addingham Football & Scouts Pavilion
Stockinger Lane
Addingham
Ilkley
West Yorkshire
LS29 0ND
- Phone:
- 07889895321
- Email:
- addinghamgsl@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window